MA H2188 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the conveyance of municipal property for the construction of mixed-use developments that include housing. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Encouraging public-private partnerships to create affordable housing at public sites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4933 |
2021-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4933 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2188.pdf |