MA H2154 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a task force to study the sustainability of emergency medical services. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a task force to study the sustainability of emergency medical services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1324 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1518 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S1367 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2739
H2176 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2739
S2739 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1518 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S1367 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2739
H2176 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2739
S2739 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2154.pdf |