MA H2103 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to enabling cities and towns to stabilize rents and protect tenants. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Enabling cities and towns to stabilize rents and protect tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-30 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1759 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2888 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4128 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2888 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4128 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2103 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2103.pdf |