MA H1143 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the health insurance prior authorization process. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve the health insurance prior authorization process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-05-30SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-06HouseReporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-04HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2023-08-29JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2379 (Similar To) 2023-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4231 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback