MA H4231 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-09 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the provision of health insurance for eligible employees and retirees in the town of Worthington. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the provision of health insurance for eligible employees and retirees in the town of Worthington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2024-08-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-12-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4231 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4231.pdf |