MA H2077 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit insurance companies from designating motor vehicle glass repair shops and require the registration of said shops. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle glass repair shop registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2189 |
2011-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
S2189 (Replaced by) 2012-04-26 - New draft substituted, see S2216
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2077 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10090&generalCourtId=1 |