MA H2050 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2152
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the sale of electronic devices used to deliver liquid nicotine vapor to minors. Public Health.
Title
Modernizing tobacco control and protecting the health of minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2152 |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2152 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - New draft substituted, see S2234
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2050 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2050.pdf |