MA H2044 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S875
Note: Legislation replaced by H4912
Note: Legislation replaced by H4912
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H4912
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H4912
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The registration of podiatrists
Title
Relative to the registration of podiatrists.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-28 | New draft substituted, see H4912 | |
2010-07-28 | Read second | |
2010-07-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-28 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-21 | Referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-21 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a bill with the same title, see H4912 | |
2010-07-07 | Recommitted to the committee on Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | |
2010-07-07 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-07 | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) | |
2010-02-08 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | |
2010-02-08 | Accompanied by S875 | |
2010-02-08 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Public Health | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S875 (Replaces) 2010-02-08 - Accompanied H2044
H4912 (Replaced by) 2010-07-28 - Ordered to a third reading
H4912 (Replaced by) 2010-07-28 - Ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H2044 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1223&generalCourtId=2 |