MA H1982 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pediatric palliative care program eligibility. Public Health.
Title
Regarding pediatric palliative care
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
S1238 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
S1238 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1982 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1982.pdf |