MA H1972 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding access to mental health services and strengthening risk assessment protocols. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Expanding access to mental health services and strengthening risk assessment protocols
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S315 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2669
H1974 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S72 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H146
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2669 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1974 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S72 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H146
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2669 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1972.pdf |