MA H1974 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of artificial intelligence in mental health services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Regulating the use of artificial intelligence (AI) in providing mental health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4712 |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H4712 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1974 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1974.pdf |