MA H1966 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local oversight of non-municipal public water supply systems. Public Health.
Title
Relative to local oversight of non-municipal public water supply systems
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4449 |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H830 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S535 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H762 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H4159 (Similar To) 2020-07-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4399
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
S535 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H762 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H4159 (Similar To) 2020-07-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4399
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1966 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1966.pdf |