MA H1958 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S1189

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied S1189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to multiple definitions of employee. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to consolidating multiple definitions of employee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateAccompanied S1189
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1189 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4626 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - New draft substituted, see H4746
H4746 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #216 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0)
S2870 (Similar To) 2024-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback