MA H1946 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-11)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to update postural screenings in schools. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To update postural screenings in schools

Sponsors

Rep. Kay Khan [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. James Murphy [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-26HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H421 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback