MA H194 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Cahill of Lynn, a petition of Daniel Cahill that the Office on Disability conduct a comprehensive study to investigate accessibility to gas pumps at gas stations. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to accessibility at gas station
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H366 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2389 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3207 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355
S2277 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2600 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H5355 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2389 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3207 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355
S2277 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2600 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H5355 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H194 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H194.pdf |