MA H1939 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4066
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to strengthening the consumer protections and ensuring the proper labeling of fish sold in the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
Relative to strengthening the consumer protections and ensuring the proper labeling of fish sold in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4066 |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4066 (Replaced by) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H186 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H186 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1939 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1939.pdf |