MA H1924 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-07 - Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to operating under the influence. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the citizens of the Commonwealth from drunk drivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1150 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied H1517
S2378 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2022 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4255 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback