MA H1883 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to penalties for persons confined to correctional facilities who commit assault or assault and battery by means of dangerous weapons upon officers, other employees, volunteers or employees of contractors. The Judiciary.
Title
To promote correctional personnel safety
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. David Robertson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H1818 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3613 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1818 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3613 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1883 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1883.pdf |