MA H1877 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. Ferguson of Holden, a petition of Kimberly N. Ferguson and others that the Department of Public Health be directed to implement a food labeling program for commercially caught, landed and sold saltwater fish. Public Health.
Title
Relative to food labeling
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied by H2009 |
2019-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2009 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1877
H811 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
S1327 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3611 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H811 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
S1327 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3611 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1877 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1877.pdf |