MA H1876 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to compensation to persons injured by acts of violence of patients, prisoners, or courtroom violence. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to acts of violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4570 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1054 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1575 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S938 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1752 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4570 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1575 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S938 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1752 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4570 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1876 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1876.pdf |