MA H1752 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to compensation for victims of wrongful conviction. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to compensation for victims of wrongful conviction
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1575 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1876 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1876 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1752 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1752.pdf |