MA S1054 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2612

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide compensation for loss of income for victims of forced labor and sexual servitude. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide compensation for loss of income for victims of forced labor and sexual servitude

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2612
2023-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S967 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1706 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H2416 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3561 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback