MA H1706 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide compensation for loss of income for victims of forced labor and sexual servitude. The Judiciary.
Title
To provide compensation for loss of income for victims of forced labor and sexual servitude
Sponsors
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Estela Reyes [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Manny Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4517 |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2226 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1706 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1706.pdf |