MA H1854 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3316
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for the municipal road and bridge maintenance needs of the Commonwealth
Title
PROVIDING FOR THE MUNICIPAL ROAD AND BRIDGE MAINTENANCE NEEDS OF THE COMMONWEALTH
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3316 |
2011-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/09/2011 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3316 (Replaced by) 2011-03-30 - New draft substituted, see H3324
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1854 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15016&generalCourtId=1 |