MA H1845 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to securing the right to strike for certain public employees. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Uplifting families and securing the right to strike for certain public employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1217 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
H48 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3851 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2540 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
H48 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3851 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2540 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1845 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1845.pdf |