MA H184 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring equal access to medical treatments essential for people with a developmental disability, intellectual disability, or autism. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Ensuring equal access to medical treatments essential for people with a developmental disability, intellectual disability, or autism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied S115 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S685 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2260 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1122 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S115 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2260 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1122 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S115 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H184.pdf |