MA S1122 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to bodily autonomy and family integrity. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to bodily autonomy and family integrity
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1435 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2891
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1783 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1074 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied H1513
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2549 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1783 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1074 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied H1513
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2549 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1122 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1122.pdf |