MA H1836 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4674

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to time and a half wages. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to time and a half wages on Sundays and legal holidays

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4674
2023-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1216 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H1855 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4281
H4281 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4441 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2603 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4674 (Replaced by) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback