MA S1216 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify employer sanctions for improper expenditure of withholdings or deductions from wages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To clarify employer sanctions for improper expenditure of withholdings or deductions from wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1216 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1216.pdf |