MA H1855 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4281

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to protecting wages of deceased employees. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to protecting wages of deceased employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4281
2023-09-14JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1216 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H483 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4583
H4281 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4441 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2603 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback