MA H1771 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the town of Barnstable to grant a certain easement to Vineyard Wind LLC. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Barnstable to grant an easement to Vineyard Wind LLC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-22 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 80 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #81 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #81 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #81 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2019-07-22 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 80) |
2019-07-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2019-07-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, amended (Cyr), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-06-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2695 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3990
H748 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - New draft substituted, see H4844
H2383 (Similar To) 2020-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2020
S1496 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2020
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S906 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3929 (Similar To) 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5210
H3951 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see H4649
H4007 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - New draft substituted, see H4805
H4219 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020
H748 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - New draft substituted, see H4844
H2383 (Similar To) 2020-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2020
S1496 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2020
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S906 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3929 (Similar To) 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5210
H3951 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see H4649
H4007 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - New draft substituted, see H4805
H4219 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020