MA H4219 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2788
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey an easement in certain land in the city of Peabody
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey an easement in certain land in the city of Peabody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #304 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 292 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 292 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #304 (40 Yeas to 0 Nays) |
2020-12-16 | House | Enacted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 292) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-29 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read a third time and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-20 | House | New draft of H2788 |
2019-11-20 | House | Pending new draft of H2788 |
2019-11-20 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H2788 (Replaces) 2019-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H4219
H4007 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - New draft substituted, see H4805
H3188 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4007 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - New draft substituted, see H4805
H3188 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546