MA H1760 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the fire district in the town of Williamstown. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to the fire district in the town of Williamstown
Sponsors
Rep. John Barrett [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Enacted |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-03-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1760.pdf |