MA H1751 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4519
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local option approval of building code amendments. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the state building code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4519 |
2011-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2011 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4519 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1751 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11868&generalCourtId=1 |