MA H1740 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Accompanied S1582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Accompanied S1582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain law enforcement records as public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To provide for the public inspection of records made or received by special state police officers at educational institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] |
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Senate | Accompanied S1582 |
2011-12-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. |
Same As/Similar To
S1582 (Replaced by) 2012-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1740 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10633&generalCourtId=1 |