MA H1659 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4028

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4028
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the use of credit reports by employers. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating the use of credit reports by employers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4028
2019-06-21JointHearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H914 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1780 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1100 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H4028 (Replaced by) 2019-08-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2310 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback