MA H1627 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3851
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Brownfields tax credit. Revenue.
Title
To amend the Brownfields tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3851 |
2017-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1474 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S224 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S628 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1966 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H177 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H605 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H620 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H617 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H1277 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S508 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H313 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H3851 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1368 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H557 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S224 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S628 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1966 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H177 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H605 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H620 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H617 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H1277 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S508 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H313 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H3851 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1368 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H557 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1627 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1627.pdf |