MA H1615 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3663
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of net worth in determining corporate excise taxes. Revenue.
Title
To clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3663 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1541 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H2608 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H3663 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3326 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2608 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H3663 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3326 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1615 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1615.pdf |