MA H1609 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4025

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to overtime protections for certain middle class workers. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating overtime protections to protect the Commonwealth's middle class workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4025
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1092 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
H4025 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2313 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback