MA H1602 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating notarization to allow for electronic notaries. The Judiciary.
Title
Modernizing notary services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4716 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1601 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
S1067 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
H4716 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1067 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
H4716 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1602 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1602.pdf |