MA H1573 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize persons of full age to petition the probate court for the adoption of an embryo. The Judiciary.
Title
Permitting the adoption of embryos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1652 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1859 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1859 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1573.pdf |