MA H1542 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to implement a pilot project for reforming re-entry and community supervision of criminal defendants and offenders. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase the use of community corrections in the supervision of criminal defendants and in the re-entry of incarcerated offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-04-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2014 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1542 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1542.pdf |