MA H1538 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the destruction and disposal of fentanyl. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to protecting law enforcement officers from fentanyl exposure
Sponsors
Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2468 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1552 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2807 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1604 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2568 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1931 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1552 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2807 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1604 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2568 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1931 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1538 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1538.pdf |