MA H1510 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting sex offenders from entering public or private school property for any reason. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to prohibit sex offenders from entering on to public or private school property for any reason
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1120 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1085 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1595 (Similar To) 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1085 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1595 (Similar To) 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1510.pdf |