MA H1595 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4517

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reclassification of sex offenders by the Sex Offender Registry Board. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maintaining the integrity of sex offender classifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4517
2023-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4095 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H4455 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4805 (Similar To) 2024-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback