MA H1493 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3862
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3862
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3862
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the registered land in the office of an assistant recorder. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to modernizing the Registries of Deeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3862 |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3862 (Replaced by) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1493 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1493.pdf |