MA H3862 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1493
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Further regulating certain record keeping at the Registries of Deeds
Title
Further regulating certain record keeping at the Registries of Deeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-09-22 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-11-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-18 | House | New draft of H1493 |
2015-11-18 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1493 (Replaces) 2015-11-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3862
H3611 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2028 (Similar To) 2016-02-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2132 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - New draft substituted, see S2156
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2278 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3611 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2028 (Similar To) 2016-02-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2132 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - New draft substituted, see S2156
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2278 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3862.pdf |