MA H1487 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the interception of wire and oral communications. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the interception of wire and oral communications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4313 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4313 (Replaced by) 2016-05-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1486 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1485 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3043 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Transportation
H908 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H438 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Accompanied H381
H1486 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1485 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3043 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Transportation
H908 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H438 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Accompanied H381
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1487 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1487.pdf |