MA H1455 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the tracking of certain electronic devices using toll collection technology and the inadmissibility of such data in criminal or civil proceeding. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the tracking of certain electronic devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4517 |
2023-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S156 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1455 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1455.pdf |