MA S156 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2630
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to cell phone distributors disclosure of RF radiation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the safe use of electronic devices by children
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2630 |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2630 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S156 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S156.pdf |